Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Credit

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 /CH0043 (SB0113/CH0044)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 (SB0233)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351 (SB0235)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0825)
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 (SB0873)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0548)
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Sources
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Baltimore City - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Ineligible Tier 1 Sources
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 /CH0284 (SB0695)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 (SB0786)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 /CH0088
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0044 (HB0092/CH0043)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0233 (HB0329)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235 (HB0351)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0961)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB1065/CH0284)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 (HB1127)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB0603)
Title
Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0746)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0092 /CH0043 (SB0113/CH0044) Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Fennell 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
Economic Matters
2/08/2019 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0329 (SB0233) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0351 (SB0235) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0825) Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0746 (SB0873) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 /CH0296 (SB0694) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Delegate Howard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0961 (SB0548) Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Tier 1 Sources Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 Baltimore City - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Ineligible Tier 1 Sources Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1065 /CH0284 (SB0695) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1091 Public-Private Partnerships - Reforms Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 (SB0786) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 /CH0088 Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0044 (HB0092/CH0043) Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Payment of Fees Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0233 (HB0329) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0235 (HB0351) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0548 (HB0961) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0694 (HB0777/CH0296) Commercial Law – Credit Card Processors – Merchant Processing Agreements Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0695 (HB1065/CH0284) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0786 (HB1127) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 (HB0603) Maryland Consumer Loan Law - Credit and Licensing Provisions Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0873 (HB0746) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM