Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Credit Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0385)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0457)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 (SB0385) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0385 (HB0457) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page