Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Credit Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0349
Title
Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0351)
Title
Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 (HB0579)
Title
Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0222 /CH0349 Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0579 (SB0351) Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0351 (HB0579) Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:21 PM
Click to return on the top page