Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cremation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0099
Title
Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Public Health - Handling of Human Remains - Transportation
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0349 /CH0099 Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Public Health - Handling of Human Remains - Transportation Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465) Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM