Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cremation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 (SB0580)
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239 (SB0775)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB1236)
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB1239)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Delegate Anderson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1236 (SB0580) Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB1239 (SB0775) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB1236) Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 (HB1239) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM