Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cremation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 /CH0450 (SB0528/CH0451)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 /CH0451 (HB1229/CH0450)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917
Title
Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1179 Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 /CH0450 (SB0528/CH0451) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 450
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0084 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2020 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 /CH0451 (HB1229/CH0450) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 451
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0917 Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:18 PM