Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Fees for Traffic and Criminal Convictions - Law Enforcement Training and Technology Fund
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0431
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Assault Weapons
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - National Crime Information Center Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 /CH0636
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0639
Title
Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874
Title
Task Force to Study Access of Individuals with Mental Illness to Regulated Firearms - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966 (SB0788)
Title
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 (SB0590)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB1178)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Required Information and Extension of Sunset
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB0966)
Title
Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Fees for Traffic and Criminal Convictions - Law Enforcement Training and Technology Fund Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 /CH0431 Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 Task Force to Study the Impact of Assault Weapons Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0663 Public Safety - Firearms - National Crime Information Center Participation Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0713 /CH0636 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 /CH0639 Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court Jurisdiction Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 Task Force to Study Access of Individuals with Mental Illness to Regulated Firearms - Extension Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
Rules
HB0876 Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task Force Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 (SB0788) Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1178 (SB0590) Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Repeal of Sunset Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 (HB1178) Public Safety - SWAT Team Reports - Required Information and Extension of Sunset Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 (HB0966) Task Force to Study Citations for Children and Law Enforcement Diversion Practices Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM