Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029 (SB0554)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115
Title
Task Force to Study Firearms and Global Positioning Satellite (GPS) Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0270)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0227
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - Shielding
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539 (SB0539)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0412 (SB0718)
Title
Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Juvenile Charged as Adult Population Forecast
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0973)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 (SB0722)
Title
Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1389
Title
Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0358)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0539)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0029)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0718 (HB0589/CH0412)
Title
Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Juvenile Charged as Adult Population Forecast
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1330)
Title
Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925
Title
Task Force to Study Computer Crimes Against Children and Child Pornography Crimes in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973 (HB1232)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 (SB0554) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0115 Task Force to Study Firearms and Global Positioning Satellite (GPS) Devices Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0355 /CH0223 (SB1088) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 (SB0270) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0397 /CH0227 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Consent Orders - Shielding Delegate Simmons 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 (SB0539) Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0589 /CH0412 (SB0718) Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Juvenile Charged as Adult Population Forecast Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0994 Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1232 (SB0973) Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1330 (SB0722) Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1389 Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0270 (HB0358) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Reporting Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0539) Task Force to Study the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0029) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0718 (HB0589/CH0412) Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Juvenile Charged as Adult Population Forecast Senator Ferguson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB1330) Task Force to Reduce Incarceration in Maryland Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0925 Task Force to Study Computer Crimes Against Children and Child Pornography Crimes in Maryland Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 (HB1232) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1088 (HB0355/CH0223) Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide Victims Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM