Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0173)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0413/CH0127)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 (SB0528)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0602/CH0042)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397
Title
Commercial Bail Data Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 /CH0091 (SB0521)
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0780
Title
Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0896 /CH0464 (SB0607)
Title
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 /CH0134
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971
Title
Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0338)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 /CH0127 (HB0339)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB0456/CH0091)
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0360)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 /CH0042 (HB0388)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB0896/CH0464)
Title
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 /CH0045
Title
Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership Fund
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0338 (SB0173) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0339 (SB0413/CH0127) Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements Delegate Carter 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0360 (SB0528) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0388 (SB0602/CH0042) Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0397 Commercial Bail Data Analysis Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 /CH0091 (SB0521) Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0780 Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate McComas 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 Law Enforcement Explorer Program - Funding Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0896 /CH0464 (SB0607) Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0954 /CH0134 Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Law Enforcement Officer - Reports Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0971 Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership Fund Delegate Oaks 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0338) Public Safety - SWAT Team - Deployment and Reporting Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0413 /CH0127 (HB0339) Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 (HB0456/CH0091) Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking Senator Lee 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0360) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Raskin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 /CH0042 (HB0388) Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0607 (HB0896/CH0464) Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0641 /CH0045 Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcomes Partnership Fund Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM