Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Public Safety - Crime Scene DNA Collection and Analysis - Status Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0211
Title
State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 /CH0800 (SB0348/CH0799)
Title
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records, Human Trafficking Awareness Training, and Hourly Accommodations
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0410 (SB0631)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 /CH0702
Title
Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202 (SB1018)
Title
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Diversionary Docket and Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 (SB0880)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1503
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 /CH0009
Title
Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0799 (HB0593/CH0800)
Title
State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 (HB0941/CH0410)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880 (HB1390)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0983 (HB1215)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018 (HB1202)
Title
Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1119
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Public Safety - Crime Scene DNA Collection and Analysis - Status Reports Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Human Trafficking Awareness Pilot Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0128 /CH0211 State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 /CH0800 (SB0348/CH0799) State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 800
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0673 Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Records, Human Trafficking Awareness Training, and Hourly Accommodations Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0941 /CH0410 (SB0631) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1065 Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 /CH0702 Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 (SB1018) Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Diversionary Docket and Workgroup Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 (SB0880) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2017 - 9:30 AM
HB1503 Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 /CH0009 Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 /CH0799 (HB0593/CH0800) State Compensation for Erroneous Conviction and Imprisonment - Certification of Error Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 799
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 (HB0941/CH0410) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0880 (HB1390) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reform Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0983 (HB1215) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 (HB1202) Human Trafficking Victims - Establishment of Workgroup Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1119 Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM