Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 /CH0148 (SB0545)
Title
Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0771 (SB1156)
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543
Title
Law Enforcement - First Responders Killed or Disabled in the Line of Duty Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578
Title
Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813
Title
Public Safety - Community Program Fund - Firearm Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 (SB0705)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 (SB1134)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1649
Title
Public Safety – Police Misconduct and Civil Rights Actions – Settlement Database
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1731
Title
Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1732
Title
Public Safety - Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1822
Title
Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107
Title
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 (HB0432/CH0148)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0920)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB0247/CH0422)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134 (HB1524)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156 (HB0447/CH0771)
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963) Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0432 /CH0148 (SB0545) Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 /CH0771 (SB1156) Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0543 Law Enforcement - First Responders Killed or Disabled in the Line of Duty Fund Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0578 Task Force to Study Law Enforcement Surveillance Technologies Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 Public Safety - Community Program Fund - Firearm Laws Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 (SB0705) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 Public Safety - Deaths Involving a Correctional Officer - Reports Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 Baltimore City - Police Department - Reports on Funds Delegate McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1524 (SB1134) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1649 Public Safety – Police Misconduct and Civil Rights Actions – Settlement Database Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1731 Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1732 Public Safety - Youth Crime Prevention and Diversion Parole Fund - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1822 Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0107 Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0545 (HB0432/CH0148) Public Safety - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund - Establishment Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0920) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 (HB0247/CH0422) Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1134 (HB1524) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1156 (HB0447/CH0771) Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM