Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Criminal Background Investigations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0633)
Title
Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0002 (SB0543)
Title
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0684)
Title
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 /CH0769
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Criminal History Records Checks - Renewals and Reinstatements
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 (SB0988)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 /CH0548 (SB0986/CH0549)
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 /CH0218 (SB0549/CH0217)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552 (SB0766)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 /CH0195
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0694/CH0002)
Title
Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 /CH0217 (HB1265/CH0218)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 (HB0581)
Title
Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0897)
Title
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1552)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 /CH0549 (HB1183/CH0548)
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988 (HB1113)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0581 (SB0633) Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check Requirement Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0694 /CH0002 (SB0543) Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017) Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2018
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0897 (SB0684) Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0912 /CH0769 State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Criminal History Records Checks - Renewals and Reinstatements Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 769
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 (SB0988) Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1183 /CH0548 (SB0986/CH0549) State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1265 /CH0218 (SB0549/CH0217) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1448 Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 (SB0766) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0045 /CH0195 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 (HB0694/CH0002) Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History (Maryland Fair Access to Education Act of 2017) Senator Conway 2 2 Veto overridden (32-15)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0549 /CH0217 (HB1265/CH0218) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 (HB0581) Maryland Medical Practice Act - Individuals Exempt From Licensure - Repeal of Criminal History Records Check Requirement Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 (HB0897) Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1552) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0948 Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 /CH0549 (HB1183/CH0548) State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0988 (HB1113) Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM