Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Criminal Background Investigations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0034)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0568)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth - Out-of-State Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0571)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811 (SB0597)
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861 (SB0691)
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039 (SB0745)
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Screening of Tenants and Renewal of Tenancy - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0299)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093)
Title
Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0732)
Title
Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0736)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 (HB0811)
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0861)
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB1039)
Title
Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0299 (SB0034) State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0373 Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0522 Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0540 /CH0093 (SB0139/CH0094) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0732 (SB0568) Health Care Practitioners - Telehealth - Out-of-State Health Care Practitioners Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0736 (SB0571) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact Speaker 3 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0811 (SB0597) State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0861 (SB0691) Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1039 (SB0745) Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1223 Landlord and Tenant - Screening of Tenants and Renewal of Tenancy - Standards Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1307 Education – Child Care Centers and Youth Development Organizations and Programs (Support Youth Development for School–Age Children Act) Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0034 (HB0299) State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0127 Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0139 /CH0094 (HB0540/CH0093) Interstate Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0568 (HB0732) Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners President 3 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0736) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact President 3 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0597 (HB0811) State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0608 Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0691 (HB0861) Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Reusable Tenant Screening Reports Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0745 (HB1039) Health Occupations – State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners – Revisions Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page