Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Criminal Injuries Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0382 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Senator Shank 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Court Costs Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM