Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Criminal Injuries Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB1005)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0830/CH0200)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Child Abuse Victims
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0986)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 /CH0177
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Membership - Family Member of Homicide Victim
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 /CH0200 (HB1244)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Child Abuse Victims
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1273)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0803)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0803 (SB1005) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1244 (SB0830/CH0200) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Child Abuse Victims Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1273 (SB0986) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 /CH0177 Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Membership - Family Member of Homicide Victim Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 /CH0200 (HB1244) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Child Abuse Victims Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 (HB1273) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1005 (HB0803) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM