Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Criminal Injuries Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0671
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Impaired Boating
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0007
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claimant Award Basis
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561
Title
Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0295 /CH0671 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Impaired Boating Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 9:30 a.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2017 - 9:30 AM
SB0022 /CH0007 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claimant Award Basis Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM