Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Criminal Injuries Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451 /CH0458 (SB0767/CH0459)
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation - Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 /CH0459 (HB1451/CH0458)
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB0247/CH0422)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 /CH0422 (SB0963) Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1451 /CH0458 (SB0767/CH0459) Criminal Injuries Compensation - Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle Delegate Vallario 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Judiciary
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0767 /CH0459 (HB1451/CH0458) Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
4/09/2018 - 7:30 PM
SB0963 (HB0247/CH0422) Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM