Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Criminal Injuries Compensation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0581)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0147
Title
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 306-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0268)
Title
Victim's Rights - Restitution
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0204 (SB0406/CH0205)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Conditions for Awards on Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0358)
Title
Victim's Rights - Restitution
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406 /CH0205 (HB0425/CH0204)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB0170)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0170 (SB0581) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0275 /CH0147 Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 306-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 147
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0358 (SB0268) Victim's Rights - Restitution Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0204 (SB0406/CH0205) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 204
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0493 Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Conditions for Awards on Claims Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0358) Victim's Rights - Restitution President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0406 /CH0205 (HB0425/CH0204) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy, Reimbursement, and Notification Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0581 (HB0170) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:01 PM