Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Curriculum

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365
Title
Montgomery County - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Affirmative Consent MC 14-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1381 /CH0608 (SB0866/CH0609)
Title
Adult High School Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461 (SB0980)
Title
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512 (SB0942)
Title
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0727
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 /CH0609 (HB1381/CH0608)
Title
Adult High School Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 /CH0849
Title
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 (HB1512)
Title
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0174 Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0365 Montgomery County - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Affirmative Consent MC 14-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1381 /CH0608 (SB0866/CH0609) Adult High School Pilot Program Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1461 (SB0980) Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1512 (SB0942) Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0727 Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program Process - Parental Consent Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 727
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 /CH0609 (HB1381/CH0608) Adult High School Pilot Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0908 /CH0849 Maryland Education Development Collaborative - Established Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 849
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0942 (HB1512) Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM