Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cybersecurity -see also- Safety

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 (SB0310)
Title
CyberMaryland Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0376)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 /CH0304
Title
Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Election Law - Securing Elections From Foreign Interference
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 /CH0480
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912
Title
Task Force on Electric Power Grid Security
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call Center
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 /CH0524
Title
Election Law - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1574
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1584
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1655
Title
Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1819 /CH0566 (SB0615/CH0567)
Title
Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0415
Title
Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0578
Title
Cybersecurity Incentive Tax Credits
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0151
Title
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 (HB0364)
Title
CyberMaryland Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 (HB0456)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 (HB1226)
Title
Career Apprenticeship Investment Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 /CH0467
Title
State Government - Security Training - Protection of Security-Sensitive Data
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 /CH0567 (HB1819/CH0566)
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882
Title
Procurement - Telecommunication and Computer Network Access - Security Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0364 (SB0310) CyberMaryland Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0376) Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0695 /CH0304 Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 Election Law - Securing Elections From Foreign Interference Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 /CH0480 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
HB0912 Task Force on Electric Power Grid Security Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1285 Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call Center Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 /CH0524 Election Law - Cybersecurity Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1574 Maryland Health Care Commission - Health Record and Payment Integration Program Advisory Committee Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1584 Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Security Breach Notification Requirements - Modifications Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Reassigned to Finance
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1655 Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality Protections Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1819 /CH0566 (SB0615/CH0567) Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0204 /CH0415 Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0578 Cybersecurity Incentive Tax Credits Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 578
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0151 Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 (HB0364) CyberMaryland Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 (HB0456) Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and Ransomware Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 (HB1226) Career Apprenticeship Investment Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. (Appropriations)
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0553 /CH0467 State Government - Security Training - Protection of Security-Sensitive Data Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 /CH0567 (HB1819/CH0566) Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 Procurement - Telecommunication and Computer Network Access - Security Requirements Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM