Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0032)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 (SB0167)
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0538)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Judgeships - District Court
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB1005)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845
Title
Courts Administration - Contracts for Stenography Services - Pro Bono Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260 (SB0644/CH0069)
Title
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0824)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1348
Title
State Government - Advertisements - Paid for by Maryland Taxpayers
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0108)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167 (HB0120)
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Vehicle Laws - Fines for Texting Offenses - Use for Educational Programs
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0439)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 /CH0069 (HB1260)
Title
State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1292)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0803)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0108 (SB0032) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0120 (SB0167) Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0439 (SB0538) Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Delegate Summers 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0500 Judgeships - District Court Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 (SB1005) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0845 Courts Administration - Contracts for Stenography Services - Pro Bono Requirement Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1260 (SB0644/CH0069) State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data Delegate Barve 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1292 (SB0824) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Delegate Jones 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1348 State Government - Advertisements - Paid for by Maryland Taxpayers Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0032 (HB0108) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0167 (HB0120) Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0214 Vehicle Laws - Fines for Texting Offenses - Use for Educational Programs Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0439) Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 /CH0069 (HB1260) State Government - Open Data Policy - Council on Open Data Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1292) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 (HB0803) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Crime Victims and Witnesses Funds - Court Costs Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM