Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 /CH0091 (SB0117)
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0237 /CH0531 (SB0150/CH0530)
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0179)
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
Courts - Grand Juries - Prohibited Action
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481 (SB0502)
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Courts - Jurors - State Per Diem Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 (SB0849)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 (SB0833)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Public Safety - District Court Commissioner - Complaints of Police Brutality
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122
Title
Voting Disclosure Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial Office
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 (HB0074/CH0091)
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0530 (HB0237/CH0531)
Title
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179 (HB0448)
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0481)
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB0866)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB0814)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1101
Title
Jurors - Qualification - Prior Conviction
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1134
Title
Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal Representation
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156
Title
Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0074 /CH0091 (SB0117) Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0199 Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0223 Circuit Court Judges - Election Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0224 Circuit Court Judges - Election Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0237 /CH0531 (SB0150/CH0530) Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0388 Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0448 (SB0179) Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0475 Courts - Grand Juries - Prohibited Action Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0481 (SB0502) Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0607 Courts - Jurors - State Per Diem Amount Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 (SB0849) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 (SB0833) Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0876 Public Safety - District Court Commissioner - Complaints of Police Brutality Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 Voting Disclosure Act of 2016 Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1164 Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial Office Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Funding Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0082 Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 (HB0074/CH0091) Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0150 /CH0530 (HB0237/CH0531) Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - Repeal Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 (HB0448) Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 (HB0481) Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Senator Miller 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB0866) Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic Violence Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 (HB0814) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1101 Jurors - Qualification - Prior Conviction Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1134 Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal Representation Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1156 Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM