Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0809 (SB0668/CH0810)
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0640 /CH0822 (SB0672/CH0823)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Courts - Business and Technology Court
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260
Title
District Court - Nonincarcerable Criminal Cases - Saturdays
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458
Title
District Court – County Zoning Violation – Appeals
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1779
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1825
Title
Public Information - Court Records - Name of Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 /JR0003 (SJ0005)
Title
Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Firearms Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 /CH0810 (HB0286/CH0809)
Title
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 /CH0823 (HB0640/CH0822)
Title
Register of Wills - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005 (HJ0003/JR0003)
Title
Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0286 /CH0809 (SB0668/CH0810) Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0513 Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of Office Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0607 Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0640 /CH0822 (SB0672/CH0823) Register of Wills - Salary Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 822
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0770 Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as Predecessor Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 Courts - Business and Technology Court Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1260 District Court - Nonincarcerable Criminal Cases - Saturdays Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1458 District Court – County Zoning Violation – Appeals Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1779 Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1825 Public Information - Court Records - Name of Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0003 /JR0003 (SJ0005) Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations Speaker 6 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court Jurisdiction Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Firearms Crimes Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan Elections Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0357 Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 /CH0810 (HB0286/CH0809) Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 /CH0823 (HB0640/CH0822) Register of Wills - Salary Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 (HJ0003/JR0003) Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM