Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 (SB0236/CH0750)
Title
Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0209)
Title
Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159 (SB0205/CH0749)
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Information on Judge or Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0914
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312
Title
Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Notation of Plea Agreement
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 (SB0595)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1361 (SB0769)
Title
Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367
Title
Juvenile Law - Diversion Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0749 (HB0159)
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0196
Title
Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0122)
Title
Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0236 /CH0750 (HB0073)
Title
Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB1329)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 (HB1361)
Title
Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813
Title
Personal Injury or Wrongful Death - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0968
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0073 (SB0236/CH0750) Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0122 (SB0209) Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Judiciary
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0159 (SB0205/CH0749) Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court Speaker 6 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0182 Judges - Mandatory Retirement Age Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Information on Judge or Magistrate Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 Judicial Elections - Retention and Frequency Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0713 Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0914 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 Clerks of the Courts - Maryland Judiciary Case Search - Notation of Plea Agreement Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1329 (SB0595) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039) State Law Library - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1361 (SB0769) Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1367 Juvenile Law - Diversion Program Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0205 /CH0749 (HB0159) Judgeships - Circuit Court and District Court President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0196 Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0122) Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0236 /CH0750 (HB0073) Jury Service - Qualification Criteria - Criminal Conviction or Charge Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0246 Circuit Court Judges - Election Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038) State Law Library - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 (HB1329) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0658 Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0769 (HB1361) Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0813 Personal Injury or Wrongful Death - Noneconomic Damages Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0968 Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM