Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559 /CH0048 (SB0408/CH0047)
Title
Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944
Title
District Court - Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant Cases
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0655)
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0152
Title
Prince George's County Sheriff - Compensation and Salaries PG 319-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 /CH0416 (SB0003)
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increases Ho. Co. 13-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 /CH0153
Title
Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 (HB1406/CH0416)
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increase
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 /CH0047 (HB0559/CH0048)
Title
Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB1022)
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 /CH0335
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0559 /CH0048 (SB0408/CH0047) Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0910 Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0944 District Court - Anne Arundel County - Landlord and Tenant Cases Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1022 (SB0655) Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 /CH0152 Prince George's County Sheriff - Compensation and Salaries PG 319-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Baltimore County Delegation 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1406 /CH0416 (SB0003) Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increases Ho. Co. 13-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Environmental Matters
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 /CH0153 Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Ho. Co. 12-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 (HB1406/CH0416) Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Increase Senator Robey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0408 /CH0047 (HB0559/CH0048) Washington County - Special Deputy Sheriffs Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB1022) Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 /CH0335 Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM