Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124 /CH0466
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0196
Title
Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 /CH0095
Title
Calvert County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0098
Title
Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0124 /CH0466 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Court Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program - Extension Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0196 Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 /CH0095 Calvert County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0098 Calvert County - Office of the Sheriff - Correctional Deputies Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM