Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 /CH0161 (SB0101/CH0162)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433
Title
Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Response to Report of Alleged Domestic Violence - Authorization PG 309-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0220 (SB0714/CH0221)
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0596)
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093
Title
Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177 /CH0438 (SB0599/CH0439)
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1554
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0162 (HB0311/CH0161)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 /CH0261 (HB0573/CH0260)
Title
Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 (HB0518)
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 /CH0439 (HB1177/CH0438)
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 /CH0221 (HB0490/CH0220)
Title
Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0311 /CH0161 (SB0101/CH0162) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Delegate Malone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 161
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0433 Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Response to Report of Alleged Domestic Violence - Authorization PG 309-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0490 /CH0220 (SB0714/CH0221) Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 220
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0518 (SB0596) Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0573 /CH0260 (SB0138/CH0261) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 260
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0995 Anne Arundel County - Sheriff - Salary Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1093 Baltimore County Circuit Court - Criminal Proceedings Court Webcast - Pilot Program Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1177 /CH0438 (SB0599/CH0439) Sheriff of Harford County - Salary Harford County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 438
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1554 Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 /CH0162 (HB0311/CH0161) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Senator Simonaire 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 162
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0138 /CH0261 (HB0573/CH0260) Harford County - Service of Process - Detention Center Employees Senator Cassilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 261
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2020 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0596 (HB0518) Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0599 /CH0439 (HB1177/CH0438) Sheriff of Harford County - Salary Harford County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0714 /CH0221 (HB0490/CH0220) Baltimore City - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 221
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0823 Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:03 PM