Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037
Title
Employment Discrimination - Dress and Grooming Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Home Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0237)
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391
Title
Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Employees Inquiring About, Discussing, or Disclosing Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0505)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098
Title
Housing Discrimination - Source of Income
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 (SB0212/CH0474)
Title
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0688)
Title
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0474 (HB1265)
Title
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 (HB0381)
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 (HB0935)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB1350)
Title
Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 Employment Discrimination - Dress and Grooming Standards Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0366 Home Act of 2014 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0381 (SB0237) Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0391 Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Employees Inquiring About, Discussing, or Disclosing Wages Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 (SB0505) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1098 Housing Discrimination - Source of Income Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 (SB0212/CH0474) Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014 Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1350 (SB0688) Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0212 /CH0474 (HB1265) Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014 Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0237 (HB0381) Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 (HB0935) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB1350) Fair Employment Preservation Act of 2014 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM