Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0728)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696 (SB0849)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175 (SB0834)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519 (SB0471)
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1551 /CH0456
Title
Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1613 (SB0876)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1659
Title
Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB1519)
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB0172)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB1175)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB0696)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1613)
Title
Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661)
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 (SB0728) Home Act of 2017 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0214 Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0254 State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0696 (SB0849) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 (SB0834) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1519 (SB0471) Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1551 /CH0456 Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1613 (SB0876) Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1659 Employment Discrimination - Sexual Harassment - Definition of Employer Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1661 (SB1191/CH0732) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0005 Extension of Statutes of Limitations Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB1519) Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 (HB0172) Home Act of 2017 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 (HB1175) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 (HB0696) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0876 (HB1613) Individuals With Disabilities - Establishing Community-Based Long-Term Services and Supports (Maryland Disability Integration Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1191 /CH0732 (HB1661) Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM