Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 (SB0671)
Title
Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257
Title
Department of Aging - Contract Review
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0823)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109
Title
State Government - Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 /CH0525 (SB1138)
Title
State Government – Discrimination and Harassment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1565 (SB1060)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0417
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 /CH0636
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0246)
Title
Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB0935)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 (HB1565)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1138 (HB1342/CH0525)
Title
Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0246 (SB0671) Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0257 Department of Aging - Contract Review Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0935 (SB0823) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 State Government - Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 /CH0525 (SB1138) State Government – Discrimination and Harassment Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
Rules
3/30/2018 - 12:30 PM
HB1565 (SB1060) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 /CH0417 Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2018 - 12:45 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0621 /CH0636 Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 (HB0246) Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 (HB0935) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1060 (HB1565) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1138 (HB1342/CH0525) Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM