Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0089
Title
Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 /CH0265
Title
Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video Streaming
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537 (SB0373/CH0196)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 (SB0021)
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0597)
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 /CH0181
Title
Financial Aid - Deaf and Hearing Impaired Students - Out-of-State Institutions of Higher Education
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 /CH0196 (HB0537)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0089 Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0413 /CH0265 Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video Streaming Delegate Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0537 (SB0373/CH0196) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0597 (SB0021) State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 (HB0597) State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0272 /CH0181 Financial Aid - Deaf and Hearing Impaired Students - Out-of-State Institutions of Higher Education Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0373 /CH0196 (HB0537) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification Senator Peters 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM