Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343
Title
Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0253)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 /CH0338 (SB0587/CH0337)
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1645
Title
Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0438)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0337 (HB1094/CH0338)
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1150
Title
Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and Guardians
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0254 State Government - Closed Captioning Activation Required Without Request Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0343 Motor Vehicles - Special Deafness Registration Plate Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0438 (SB0253) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1094 /CH0338 (SB0587/CH0337) Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1645 Task Force to Study Mental Health Concerns for Deaf and Hard of Hearing Individuals Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0253 (HB0438) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 /CH0337 (HB1094/CH0338) Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1150 Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and Guardians Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM