Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013
Title
Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) Check
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0039 (SB0736/CH0379)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Handgun Locking Devices - Repeal Exclusivity of Internal Locks - Requirements for External or Internal Lock System
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 (SB0303)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Montgomery County - Rectifiers and Bottlers - Liquor Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers MC 25-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Wheeled Devices and Metal Piping
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0772
Title
Public Safety - Firearms Safety Training Course - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 (SB0530)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254
Title
State Boat Act - Registered Vessel - Disclosure of Owner Information
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266
Title
Public Health - Sale, Offer for Sale, and Distribution of Powdered Caffeine - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0917)
Title
Maryland Salvage Advertising Act
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0303 (HB0222)
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0857)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0379 (HB0039)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 (HB1269)
Title
Maryland Salvage Advertising Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 Regulated Firearms - Licensed Dealer or Secondary Seller - National Instant Criminal Background (NICS) Check Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0039 (SB0736/CH0379) Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0160 Handgun Locking Devices - Repeal Exclusivity of Internal Locks - Requirements for External or Internal Lock System Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 (SB0303) Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0459 Montgomery County - Rectifiers and Bottlers - Liquor Sales and Delivery to Retail Dealers MC 25-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0557 Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Wheeled Devices and Metal Piping Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0772 Public Safety - Firearms Safety Training Course - Repeal Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 (SB0530) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1015 Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1254 State Boat Act - Registered Vessel - Disclosure of Owner Information Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1266 Public Health - Sale, Offer for Sale, and Distribution of Powdered Caffeine - Prohibition Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1269 (SB0917) Maryland Salvage Advertising Act Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0303 (HB0222) Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0857) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0736 /CH0379 (HB0039) Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - Repeal Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 (HB1269) Maryland Salvage Advertising Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Required Records - Photograph of Precious Metal Object Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 9:45 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/11/2015 - 9:45 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM