Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0541/CH0073)
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Required Notices - Method of Mailing
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 /CH0633
Title
Criminal Law - Altering References From Mentally Defective to Substantially Cognitively Impaired Individual
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 /CH0694 (SB0750/CH0693)
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001 (SB0943)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 (SB1006)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Criminal Penalties
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1387 /CH0709 (SB1054/CH0708)
Title
Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0073 (HB0575)
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Required Notices - Method of Mailing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0564
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Purchase of Beer by Retail Dealers From Manufacturers and Wholesalers
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0041
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0693 (HB0919/CH0694)
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB1001)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006 (HB1313)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Criminal Penalties
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 /CH0708 (HB1387/CH0709)
Title
Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1127
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required Signs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0575 (SB0541/CH0073) Portable Electronics Insurance - Required Notices - Method of Mailing Delegate Jameson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0749 Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0822 /CH0633 Criminal Law - Altering References From Mentally Defective to Substantially Cognitively Impaired Individual Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0919 /CH0694 (SB0750/CH0693) Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement Delegate Jameson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 694
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1001 (SB0943) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1313 (SB1006) Justice Reinvestment Act - Criminal Penalties Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1387 /CH0709 (SB1054/CH0708) Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - Establishment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0541 /CH0073 (HB0575) Portable Electronics Insurance - Required Notices - Method of Mailing Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0587 /CH0564 Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0697 Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Purchase of Beer by Retail Dealers From Manufacturers and Wholesalers Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0724 /CH0041 Alcoholic Beverages Article President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 /CH0693 (HB0919/CH0694) Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Vendor Employees - Repeal of Sunset and Reporting Requirement Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0943 (HB1001) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 (HB1313) Justice Reinvestment Act - Criminal Penalties President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 /CH0708 (HB1387/CH0709) Commercial Northern Snakehead Bowfishing License - Establishment Senator Mathias 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 708
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1127 Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required Signs Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM