Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042 /CH0314
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0115
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0343
Title
Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Wholesalers - Payment on Delivery
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Mixture
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847
Title
Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922
Title
Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 /CH0314 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 /CH0115 Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Cell Tower Batteries - Required Record Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0612 Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0781 /CH0343 Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Delegate Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1338 Alcoholic Beverages - Wholesalers - Payment on Delivery Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1448 Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Mixture Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0948 Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM