Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309
Title
Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0502)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018 (SB0793)
Title
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 (SB0432)
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0017
Title
Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control Purposes
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB1157)
Title
Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0502 (HB0600)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 (HB1018)
Title
Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0309 Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment Delegate Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0502) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB0634 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0814 Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment Fees Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 (SB0793) Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 (SB0432) Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure Requirements Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0067 /CH0017 Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control Purposes Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 (HB1157) Consumer Protection - Consumer Debt Collection - Disclosure Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0502 (HB0600) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0793 (HB1018) Task Force to Study the Use of Private Diversion Programs Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM