Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0384
Title
Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417
Title
Business Regulation - Collection Agency - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 (SB0562)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0603
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704 /CH0277 (SB0160/CH0276)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0276 (HB0704/CH0277)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284
Title
Business Regulation - Collection Agency Licensing - Exception for Passive Debt Buyers
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0452)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0127 /CH0384 Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0417 Business Regulation - Collection Agency - Definition Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0452 (SB0562) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 /CH0603 Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0704 /CH0277 (SB0160/CH0276) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1032 Consumer Debt Collection - Statute of Limitations (Maryland Zombie Debt Act) Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act) Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0160 /CH0276 (HB0704/CH0277) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0284 Business Regulation - Collection Agency Licensing - Exception for Passive Debt Buyers Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0562 (HB0452) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM