Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 /CH0079 (SB0092)
Title
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0323)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0093 (SB0561)
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 (SB0565)
Title
Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 /CH0100 (SB0417)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Creditors' Claims - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197 (SB0875)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0851)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 /CH0122
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 (HB0230/CH0079)
Title
Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 /CH0152
Title
Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0442)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0666/CH0100)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Creditors' Claims - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 (HB0549/CH0093)
Title
Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 (HB0637)
Title
Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 (HB1232)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB1197)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 /CH0079 (SB0092) Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Hammen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 (SB0323) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0549 /CH0093 (SB0561) Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0637 (SB0565) Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0666 /CH0100 (SB0417) Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Creditors' Claims - Limitations Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0840 Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0951 Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1050 Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1197 (SB0875) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1232 (SB0851) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1241 /CH0122 Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0092 (HB0230/CH0079) Health Insurance - Assignment of Benefits and Reimbursement of Nonpreferred Providers - Repeal of Termination Date Senator Middleton 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0121 /CH0152 Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0442) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0417 (HB0666/CH0100) Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Creditors' Claims - Limitations Senator Lee 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 Estates and Trusts - Funeral Expenses Allowance - Modified Administration Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0561 (HB0549/CH0093) Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Intercepts for Restitution Payments Senator Peters 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 (HB0637) Real Property - Redeemable Ground Rents Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0851 (HB1232) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 (HB1197) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM