Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499 (SB1085)
Title
Procurement - Accelerated Payments to Subcontractors
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 (SB0510)
Title
Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Investments
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783
Title
Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 (SB0773)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491 (SB0771/CH0579)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0342
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0347
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Authority of the Secretary
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393)
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0546)
Title
Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Investments
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 /CH0579 (HB1491)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773 (HB1159)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1085 (HB0499)
Title
Procurement - Accelerated Payments to Subcontractors
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1132
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0499 (SB1085) Procurement - Accelerated Payments to Subcontractors Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 (SB0510) Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Investments Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0783 Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 (SB0773) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1450 /CH0393 (SB0471/CH0392) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1491 (SB0771/CH0579) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0342 Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for Fraud Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0347 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Authority of the Secretary Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0392 (HB1450/CH0393) Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0510 (HB0546) Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Investments Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 /CH0579 (HB1491) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 (HB1159) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions President 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1085 (HB0499) Procurement - Accelerated Payments to Subcontractors Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1132 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM