Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0245 (SB0021/CH0244)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0916)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0402)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 /CH0777 (SB0966)
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Nonpayment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0782)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494)
Title
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB0770)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 /CH0479
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and Registrants
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 (HB1002/CH0777)
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0245 (SB0021/CH0244) Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits - Collection by Assessment Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0525 Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - Definition Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0770 (SB0916) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 (SB0402) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1002 /CH0777 (SB0966) Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1146 Labor and Employment - General Contractor Liability for Nonpayment of Wages Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 (SB0459/CH0807) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Rules
SB0402 (HB0782) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 /CH0807 (HB1494) Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment Prohibition Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0916 (HB0770) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Student Education Loan Servicers Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0924 /CH0479 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Surety Bond Requirements for Licensees and Registrants Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 (HB1002/CH0777) Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM