Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0334 (SB0262)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0183 (SB0425/CH0184)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419
Title
Higher Education - Report on Collection Practices for Unpaid Fees and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0446/CH0554)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Disorderly School Closures
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 (SB0873)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 (SB0760/CH0581)
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0470 (SB0875)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1531
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Central Collection Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1562
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0334)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0302 (HB0678/CH0301)
Title
Real Property - Allegany County - Transfer of Property on Assessment Books
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 /CH0184 (HB0365/CH0183)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 /CH0554 (HB0469)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 /CH0581 (HB1173)
Title
Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB1081)
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0136 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0199 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0334 (SB0262) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0183 (SB0425/CH0184) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 183
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0419 Higher Education - Report on Collection Practices for Unpaid Fees and Services Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0469 (SB0446/CH0554) Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Disorderly School Closures Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1081 (SB0873) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 (SB0760/CH0581) Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1420 /CH0470 (SB0875) Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1430 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1499 Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1531 State Finance and Procurement - Central Collection Unit - Powers Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1562 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0262 (HB0334) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 /CH0302 (HB0678/CH0301) Real Property - Allegany County - Transfer of Property on Assessment Books Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 302
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0425 /CH0184 (HB0365/CH0183) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 184
Finance
2/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0446 /CH0554 (HB0469) Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0760 /CH0581 (HB1173) Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0873 (HB1081) Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:37 PM