Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Management

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 /CH0187 (SB0314/CH0186)
Title
State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission - Composition
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 (SB0381/CH0146)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783
Title
Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 /CH0690 (SB0676/CH0689)
Title
College Affordability Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0001
Title
National Goal of Debt-Free Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0341
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 /CH0186 (HB0136/CH0187)
Title
State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission - Composition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381 /CH0146 (HB0460)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503
Title
Education - Online Instructional Program for Financial Literacy
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0689 (HB1014/CH0690)
Title
College Affordability Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1132
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 /CH0187 (SB0314/CH0186) State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission - Composition Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0460 (SB0381/CH0146) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage Loans Speaker 3 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB0783 Consumer Protection - Collection and Sale of Consumer Debt - Restrictions Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1014 /CH0690 (SB0676/CH0689) College Affordability Act of 2016 Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690
Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1451 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0001 National Goal of Debt-Free Higher Education Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0341 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special Funds Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 /CH0186 (HB0136/CH0187) State Government - Financial Education and Capability Commission - Composition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 /CH0146 (HB0460) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage Loans President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0503 Education - Online Instructional Program for Financial Literacy Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0676 /CH0689 (HB1014/CH0690) College Affordability Act of 2016 Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1132 Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and Fee Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM