Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Management

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1487
Title
Workgroup to Study Adopting the Uniform Voidable Transactions Act
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1642 (SB1012)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB1642)
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1487 Workgroup to Study Adopting the Uniform Voidable Transactions Act Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1642 (SB1012) Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Student Education Loans – Ombudsman Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1012 (HB1642) Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Student Education Loans - Ombudsman and Licensing of Servicers Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Rosapepe)
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM