Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Management

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059 /CH0090
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171
Title
Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380 (SB0265/CH0303)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0731)
Title
Build to Learn Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 (SB0873)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0303 (HB0380)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648
Title
Insurance - Group Retirement Annuities - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB0727)
Title
Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Supplemental Funds
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0746)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 /CH0090 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Debt Settlement Services Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0171 Elections - Campaign Finance Entities - Termination and Filing of Final Campaign Finance Report Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0380 (SB0265/CH0303) Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension Delegate Walker 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 (SB0731) Build to Learn Act of 2019 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 (SB0873) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0303 (HB0380) Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 Insurance - Group Retirement Annuities - Protections Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0731 (HB0727) Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Supplemental Funds Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0873 (HB0746) Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM