Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Debt Management

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0020 (SB0001)
Title
Built to Learn Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0446/CH0554)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Disorderly School Closures
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 (HB0001/CH0020)
Title
Built to Learn Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Peters
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 /CH0554 (HB0469)
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0020 (SB0001) Built to Learn Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Appropriations
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0469 (SB0446/CH0554) Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Disorderly School Closures Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0001 (HB0001/CH0020) Built to Learn Act of 2020 Senator Peters 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0446 /CH0554 (HB0469) Institutions of Postsecondary Education – Disorderly School Closures Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:40 PM