Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 (SB0199/CH0205)
Title
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 (SB0465)
Title
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0910)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199 /CH0205 (HB0088)
Title
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 (HB0522)
Title
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1021)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994
Title
Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 (SB0199/CH0205) Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0522 (SB0465) Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0946 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0910) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 /CH0205 (HB0088) Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 (HB0522) Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Senator Stone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0910 (HB1021) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0994 Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB1016 Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM