Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0473 (SB0186/CH0472)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0991)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 (SB0347)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322 (SB0755)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0850/CH0561)
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0472 (HB0202/CH0473)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230
Title
Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0840)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 (HB1322)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346)
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0422)
Title
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0202 /CH0473 (SB0186/CH0472) Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Economic Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0422 (SB0991) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 (SB0347) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 (SB0755) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0850/CH0561) Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 /CH0472 (HB0202/CH0473) Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0230 Real Property - Priority of Refinance Mortgage Over Junior Liens - Amount of Refinance Mortgage Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 (HB0840) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Senator Raskin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 (HB1322) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 /CH0561 (HB1346) Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0422) Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - Prohibited Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM