Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0103
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program - Intrafamily Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 /CH0487
Title
Property Tax - Property Transferred to New Owner - Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524
Title
Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 /CH0602
Title
Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0389 /CH0103 Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program - Intrafamily Transfers Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 /CH0487 Property Tax - Property Transferred to New Owner - Appeals Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration Requirement Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 /CH0602 Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page