Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0520 (SB0376/CH0521)
Title
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 /CH0521 (HB0595/CH0520)
Title
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0484
Title
Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 /CH0662
Title
Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 AM
HB0320 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 /CH0520 (SB0376/CH0521) Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1046 Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 /CH0521 (HB0595/CH0520) Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 /CH0484 Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative Disclosures Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 /CH0662 Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM