Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266
Title
Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720)
Title
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0883)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Homeowners Associations - Recorded Covenants or Restrictions - Deletion of Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0340
Title
Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1007)
Title
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0266 Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720) Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1007 (SB0883) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1066 Homeowners Associations - Recorded Covenants or Restrictions - Deletion of Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included Charges Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0340 Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities Assessments Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB1007) Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM